BERWICK-UPON-TWEED COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1109088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Crawford Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
John Fisher Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
ALAN RICHARD BOWLAS Trustee None on record
David Purvis Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
David Roderick Harper Chair 01 June 2018 None on record
Colette Janet Maria Harper Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Keith Barrington Siseman Trustee 21 March 2016 None on record
Daniel Inglis Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
Sally Ann Holborn Trustee 19 September 2019 None on record