AL FITRA SCHOOL

Charity number: 1110871
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/08/2015 14/08/2016 14/08/2017 14/08/2018 14/08/2019
Total gross income £6.35k £5.02k £7.85k £10.72k £7.90k
Total expenditure £5.41k £4.90k £6.00k £8.75k £9.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A