LOWLAND SEARCH DOGS (SUSSEX)

Charity number: 1110700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.56k £19.48k £14.18k £11.08k £7.98k
Total expenditure £15.49k £11.21k £6.47k £3.10k £8.42k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A