BOW BENGALI FORUM

Charity number: 1109297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.55k £3.09k £11.09k £6.68k £6.08k
Total expenditure £3.19k £4.22k £8.03k £6.03k £6.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A