Accounts and annual returns ARENA

Charity number: 1113321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 April 2021 31 March 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 26 April 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 26 April 2019 30 December 2020 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 26 April 2018 30 December 2020 673 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 26 April 2017 19 June 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 April 2017 Not Required