Financial history ARENA

Charity number: 1113321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/04/2017 26/04/2018 26/04/2019 26/04/2020 26/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £2.40k £2.20k £1.80k £1.60k
Total expenditure £0 £200 £200 £200 £200
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A