JAMYANG BUDDHIST CENTRE LEEDS

Charity number: 1109242
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 25 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 11 April 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)