JAMYANG BUDDHIST CENTRE LEEDS

Charity number: 1109242
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k
Other income £46.61k £137.91k £168.76k £198.50k £105.51k
Total expenditure £55.33k £70.56k £73.76k £150.19k £104.98k