JAMYANG BUDDHIST CENTRE LEEDS

Charity number: 1109242
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Ann Martindale Trustee 07 October 2020 None on record
Marie-Odile Joelle Jacqueline Leconte Chair 02 May 2019 None on record
Unjyn Park Trustee 08 October 2017 None on record
David Midgley Trustee 26 October 2015
LEEDS FAITHS FORUM Charity reporting is up to date
Adam Peter Bowley Trustee 07 October 2020 None on record
Jay Simpson Trustee 06 October 2019 None on record