COUNTERPARTS MUSIC THEATRE ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1109259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

promote, maintain, improve and advance education by the encouragement of the arts, including without limitation, the arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COUNTERPARTS MTA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Leslie Peck Trustee 29 June 2014
None on record
Dorigen Anne Couchman Trustee 29 June 2014
None on record
Catherine Julie Sandbrook Trustee 15 November 2013
None on record
IAN JOHN SMALL Trustee
None on record
HELEN URSEM Trustee
None on record
PETER URSEM Trustee
None on record
HELEN PENGELLY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 August 2024 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 February 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gresham House
Albaston
Gunnislake
PL18 9AB
Phone:
01822833668