MARANATHA MINISTRIES EXETER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitate Christian conferences in UK & going into churches to train/equip people for ministry. Speaking at conferences in Europe, the Arctic & North America. Facilitate teaching & equipping conferences in Exeter for up to 1200/1500 people and similar conferences throughout the Country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
- Poland
- United States
Governance
- 05 May 2005: Standard registration
- 02 January 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 January 2014: Funds transferred to 1148070 MARANATHA CHURCH EXETER
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.61k | £64.17k | £52.60k | £37.85k | £26.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.62k | £58.65k | £55.58k | £43.50k | £29.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 07 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 07 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 22 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 22 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 21 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PROCLAIM THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL WORLDWIDE 2. TO OFFER RELIEF TO PERSONS IN HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS WORLDWIDE 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FORM OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING CENTRES, PREPARING PERSONS FOR MINISTRY, MISSION AND CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP WORLDWIDE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window