OAKDALE HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1112162
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 23 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 05 October 2018 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 06 October 2018 6 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 21 October 2016 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 21 October 2016 21 days late Download