LEWISHAM DAY CENTRE FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES

Charity number: 1111418
Charity reporting is 1497 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not yet received
36 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not yet received
36 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not yet received
402 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not yet received
402 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not yet received
767 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not yet received
767 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not yet received
1132 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not yet received
1132 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not yet received
1497 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not yet received
1497 days overdue
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)