Accounts and annual returns YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION IN SANDWELL LIMITED

Charity number: 1109403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window