Financial history WATERFRONT COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1109435
Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.93k £5.34k £3.62k £976 £0
Total expenditure £3.76k £3.46k £4.60k £1.81k £42
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A