BELARUSIAN INTERNATIONAL PUBLIC CHARITABLE ORGANISATION HELPING HANDS BRITISH BRANCH

Charity number: 1113197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 08 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 01 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 June 2017 On time Download