SUNRISE MULTICULTURAL PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides services for ethnic minority families in Banbury in such ways as the trustees shall think fit, and in particular by the advancement of education including the provision of nurseries, out of school clubs and adult education courses, the preservation and protection of good health by the provision of advocacy, advice and support, and provision of recreational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 September 2005: Standard registration
- 08 April 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1192766 SUNRISE MULTICULTURAL PROJECT CIO
- MULTI-CULTURAL PLAY PROJECT (Working name)
- SUNRISE MULTI-CULTURAL PLAY PROJECT (Previous name)
- SUNRISE MULTI-CULTURAL PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.84k | £119.78k | £126.30k | £189.38k | £202.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.12k | £93.48k | £113.08k | £154.39k | £144.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.23k | £0 | £19.03k | £2.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 24 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 24 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 3 AUGUST 2005. NAME AMENDED BR RESOLUTION OF 9TH OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 07 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF ETHNIC MINORITY FAMILIES IN BANBURY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF NURSERIES, OUT OF SCHOOL CLUBS AND ADULT EDUCATION COURSES; (2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY, ADVICE AND SUPPORT; AND (3) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BANBURY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window