Accounts and annual returns DISASTER RESPONSE LOGISTICS

Charity number: 1109570
Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 455 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 455 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 16 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 23 February 2021 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required