UTTOXETER COMMUNITY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children in the subject of Environmental & Rural Science, by providing and assisting in the provision of farm facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 October 2005: Standard registration
- U C F (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie RUDGE | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JUSTINE NORTH | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 July 2023 | 392 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 July 2023 | 757 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 July 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN UTTOXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND VETERINARY SCIENCE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY FARM. THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES IN UTTOXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY FARM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR LIVES
Area of benefit
UTTOXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
THOMAS ALLEYNES HIGH SCHOOL
DOVE BANK
UTTOXETER
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST14 8DU
- Phone:
- 01889561820
- Email:
- BURSAR@TAHS.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window