Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TAVISTOCK HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1111183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.68k £4.60k £4.01k £7.76k £1.50k
Total expenditure £3.09k £3.86k £6.69k £13.51k £8.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A