Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER REFUGEE SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1109990
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time