BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION

Charity number: 1110745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time Download