HIDEAWAY YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hideaway aims to improve the conditions of life of children and young people in the Greater Manchester area by providing facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation; to help and educate children and young people so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities so that they may grow to full maturity as individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £63,017 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 15 August 2005: Standard registration
- HIDEAWAY YOUTH PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAHRA ALIJAH | Chair | 22 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Eula Miller | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Daye | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Ivan Benett | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Cotterill | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Williams | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIALL ANTHONY COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.58k | £295.88k | £342.22k | £285.36k | £221.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.44k | £225.22k | £339.59k | £282.07k | £282.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £63.02k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, CULTURE, RACE, DISABILITY, RELIGION OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL. MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. TO RELIEVE THE EFFECTS OF DISTRESS CAUSED BY POVERTY ON YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT ON MATTERS RELATED TO THEIR HEALTH, PERSONAL AND SOCIAL EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING, WELL- BEING AND WELFARE. TO UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amani Centre
Quinney Crescent
Manchester
M16 7DG
- Phone:
- 0161 226 7325
- Email:
- julie@thehideaway.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window