Accounts and annual returns HIS CHURCH - LONDON

Charity number: 1109725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 10 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 08 March 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 08 March 2019 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window