CITY HEARTS (UK)

Charity number: 1110314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.63m £2.69m £3.49m £4.40m £6.23m
Total expenditure £1.49m £2.42m £3.04m £4.25m £5.66m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £4.14m £6.13m
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £32.82k £65.83k £63.01k £186.29k £97.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.60m £2.62m £3.42m £4.22m £6.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £620 £557
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £223
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £2.42m £3.04m £4.25m £5.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.41k
Expenditure - Governance £1.10k £3.00k £2.46k £2.70k £3.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £148.39k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0