BONABOTO

Charity number: 1110706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.18k £3.20k £4.45k £4.16k £6.45k
Total expenditure £3.14k £2.90k £3.26k £2.54k £11.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A