SHERNHALL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1109566
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3231 days
Annual return 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3597 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3597 days
Annual return 31 March 2010 11 February 2011 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 11 February 2011 11 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 18 November 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 December 2009 On time
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 January 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 16 March 2009 44 days late