FACE FRONT INCLUSIVE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with disabled and non-disabled artists, producing professional, and challenging theatre. Its aims are to: Use the arts as a tool for social engagement in all aspects of society. Provide programmes that enable disadvantaged adults and children to participate in the arts.Develop productions that explore social issues, raise awareness and enable people to engage in the process of change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,210 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mevna Bulathsinhala | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Siwan Thomas-Gibson | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Fernandes | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shamima Lutfee Gazi | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ayo Oyebade | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Thomas | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine King | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean Langford | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER COWE | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Meseret Zekai | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.01k | £233.76k | £602.08k | £371.75k | £353.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.63k | £205.54k | £446.24k | £391.48k | £414.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.97k | N/A | N/A | £146.30k | £23.21k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £571.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £25.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £440 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £446.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUNE 2006. AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF THEATRE, DRAMA, POETRY, SINGING, DANCE, MOVEMENT AND MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 MARKET SQUARE
EDMONTON GREEN
LONDON
N9 0TZ
- Phone:
- 020 8350 3461
- Email:
- hello@facefront.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window