Financial history HINDU WELFARE ASSOCIATION OF ESSEX

Charity number: 1111503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £81.50k £63.16k £67.11k £81.76k £81.88k
Total expenditure £43.27k £31.50k £39.18k £37.49k £30.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £7.41k £25.39k