SOUTHAMPTON CLASSICAL GUITAR SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fostering the art of playing the classical guitar through regular meetings, music workshops, lectures, concerts & promoting new musical talent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 July 2005: Standard registration
- SCGS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Thompson | Chair | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hazel Margaret Inskip | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Daniel Edward Clark | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Peter Whalley | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denis Gibson | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Tait | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.37k | £2.62k | £1.43k | £5.96k | £4.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.99k | £1.45k | £2.85k | £6.69k | £4.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 28TH JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF THE CLASSICAL GUITAR AND RELATED INSTRUMENTS, THEIR MUSIC AND PRACTICAL TECHNIQUES, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS RECITALS AND EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PRESHAW HOUSE
PRESHAW
UPHAM
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1HP
- Phone:
- 07889 968952
- Email:
- enquiries@scgs-guitar.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window