THE DOLPHIN SQUARE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1110090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.01m £8.63m £9.24m £9.22m £12.10m
Total expenditure £6.40m £8.04m £7.08m £7.18m £11.47m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.50m £83.33k £500.00k N/A £504.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £589.25k £922.26k £700.49k £699.44k £1.11m
Income - Charitable activities £18.14m £7.11m £8.03m £8.31m £10.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £283.36k £605.81k £442.50k £188.60k £58.65k
Income - Other £0 £83.33k £565.99k £23.94k £838.79k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.14m £4.69m £5.28m £5.36m £7.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.75k £260.42k £45.12k £19.54k £5.22k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £27.26k £31.51k £41.31k £32.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.20k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £19.75k £260.42k £45.12k £19.54k £5.22k
Expenditure - Other £2.24m £3.09m £1.76m £1.80m £3.74m