OXFORD PARENT-INFANT PROJECT

Charity number: 1109956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download