OXFORD PARENT-INFANT PROJECT

Charity number: 1109956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £444.80k £334.08k £253.69k £332.82k £292.87k
Total expenditure £495.91k £328.42k £274.36k £327.17k £324.26k
Income from government contracts £85.55k £85.50k N/A N/A £9.03k
Income from government grants £127.47k £2.25k £3.71k £2.00k N/A