OXFORD PARENT-INFANT PROJECT

Charity number: 1109956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Burns Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
Katherine Peto Trustee 19 June 2018 None on record
SHAMUS DONALD Trustee 25 May 2017 None on record
Mr Rob Kenny Chair 16 May 2018 None on record
Lawrence Edward Judd Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
ANNE URSULA WILLCOCKS Trustee 16 May 2018
THE NORTHWICK TRUST Received: On time
Dr Jessica Gibson Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Jane King Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Dr SUSANNA GRAHAM-JONES Trustee 25 February 2016
THE EXUBERANT TRUST Received: On time
LEY COMMUNITY DRUG SERVICES Received: 12 days late
Fiona Steel Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
Elisabeth Willmott Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record