SKYLARK CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church. We have several groups that work into the community, providing support for young and old including self esteem programmes, youth club, Toddlers and carers group, and community support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£622,578
Donations and legacies | £589.32k | |
Charitable activities | £30.66k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.61k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£549,369
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £549.37k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £549.37k | |
Retained for future use | £73.21k |
People

7 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 10 June 2005: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN GROWTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- CHRISTIAN GROWTH CENTRE CHELMSFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE JON BISHOP | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Wendy Ward | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Kemp | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Nicola Alice Sims | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
Peter Sims | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
JOHN ANTONY GRAYSTON BA, ALBC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £513.97k | £484.19k | £454.61k | £532.05k | £622.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £503.53k | £508.55k | £450.42k | £526.42k | £549.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.09k | N/A | £13.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £491.02k | N/A | N/A | £499.99k | £589.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £22.78k | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £31.17k | £30.66k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £170 | N/A | N/A | £892 | £2.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £59.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £503.53k | N/A | N/A | £526.42k | £549.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.50k | N/A | N/A | £8.66k | £9.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £53.54k | N/A | N/A | £55.80k | £78.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £840.16k | N/A | N/A | £784.12k | £765.65k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £127.29k | N/A | N/A | £134.84k | £215.24k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £509.18k | N/A | N/A | £475.22k | £463.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/12/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN CHELMSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO FURTHER CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF CHELMSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF CHELMSFORD THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (D) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES (WHETHER IN A PURPOSE-BUILT COMMUNITY CENTRE OR OTHERWISE) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHELMSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD WHICH FACILITIES MAY WITHOUT LIMITATION INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF CHILD-CARE SERVICES AND MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE IN PARTICULAR CHELMSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SKYLARK CHURCH
4 HANBURY ROAD
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM1 3AE
- Phone:
- 01245255775
- Email:
- admin@skylarkchurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window