THE FOUNDATION FOR LAW JUSTICE AND SOCIETY

Charity number: 1111842
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £167.10k £120.18k £126.22k £150.90k £99.57k
Total expenditure £170.03k £108.15k £129.44k £138.01k £109.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £100.00k £0 N/A N/A