SATWARA.COM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Satwara.com has been advancing the Hindu relegion amongst the Satwara Community by organising events to celebrate Hindu festivals such as Navratri and Diwali and other activities such as Bhajans (devotional songs) at the Shree Snatan Seva Samaj - Hindu temple in Luton. The charity provides regular feedback through the newsletter "Satwara Voice" and by holding of an Annual General Meeting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 2006: Standard registration
- SATWARA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIKSHA SONGARA | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
KISHORE KATECHIA | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MENAL KATECHIA | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SANJAY KANZARIA | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JITENDRAKUMAR KATECHIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.73k | £47 | £9.59k | £11.61k | £9.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £50 | £13.17k | £9.82k | £9.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 9 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THE HINDU COMMUNITY KNOWN AS THE SATWARA COMMUNITY. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE RELIEF OF THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF THE ELDERLY AMONGST THE COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AID AND ADVICE. (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE HINDU CULTURE. (4) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ONE OR MORE COMMUNITY CENTRES (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (5) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Knevett Close
COLCHESTER
CO4 5HQ
- Phone:
- 01206422332
- Email:
- satwara.community@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window