CREATIVE COOPERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Visiting projects in Ethiopia, making new contacts & researching new projects ideas. We have been fundraising for a new football tournament for boys and girls teams in Ethiopia and will start sending funds to them for much needed equipment. Raised funds for primary school equipment and class room repairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 09 August 2005: Standard registration
- CCO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE JOHN MOORE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Jones | Trustee | 28 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA STAPLETON | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
VETA MELETA GORDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £450 | £250 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1 | £745 | £1.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 8 JANUARY 2005, AS AMENDED 12 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AFRICAN CONTINENT AS WELL AS THE DIASPORA, (THE AREAS OF BENEFIT) AND ESPECIALLY ETHIOPIA, BUT ALSO INCLUDING SPECIFIC IDENTIFIED PROJECTS IN OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES, BY THE PROVISION OF SKILLS AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN A RANGE OF OCCUPATIONAL AREAS. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS WITHIN THE AREAS OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORTED WORKSHOP FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT TO ASSIST THOSE IN NEED TO BECOME SELF SUFFICIENT. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS WITHIN THE AREAS OF BENEFIT BY PROVISION OF PRODUCE OR GOODS BY WAY OF DONATION, OR OF SERVICES. PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITY FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITY, INCLUDING CULTURAL AND ARTS ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR ETHIOPIA, (THE AREA OF BENEFIT)
Contact information
- Address:
-
CREATIVE CO-OPERATION
232 CLAREMONT ROAD
MANCHESTER
M14 4TS
- Phone:
- 07788426194
- Email:
- neville.moore@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window