Accounts and annual returns ANDREDESWEALD CHAPTER CHARITY ACCOUNT

Charity number: 1111620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 310 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required