Financial history ANDREDESWEALD CHAPTER CHARITY ACCOUNT

Charity number: 1111620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £4.59k £594 £851 £315 £0
Total expenditure £2.66k £250 £250 £1.10k £25
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A