MAIDSTONE YMCA

Charity number: 1110087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 September 2016 On time Download