Accounts and annual returns BRIGHTER FUTURE INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1110823
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 April 2019 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 24 April 2019 78 days late Download Open in new window