PSC TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Primary Sclerosing Cholangitis Trust is a medical research trust established to support research :- + use simple language to explain psc and related conditions; + promote the advancement of education into PSC and related conditions; + fund dedicated research fellows into the disease; + promote the support network for sufferers; + raise awareness of PSC Trust aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- India
- Malaysia
Governance
- 14 July 2005: Standard registration
- 16 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PRIMARY SCLEROSING CHOLANGITIS TRUST (Working name)
- PSC TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/03/2006 | 31/05/2007 | 08/03/2008 | 08/03/2009 | 08/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.82k | £11.56k | £6.11k | £660 | £490 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.74k | £3.51k | £4.30k | £650 | £222 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 08 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 08 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 08 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 08 March 2010 | 05 July 2012 | 544 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 March 2009 | 16 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF PRIMARY SCLEROSING CHOLANGITIS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PRIMARY SCLEROSING CHOLANGITIS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window