Financial history CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND

Charity number: 1110782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £423.52k £440.61k £406.61k £416.71k £416.19k
Total expenditure £430.79k £531.62k £369.08k £367.57k £385.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A