Trustees CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND
Charity number: 1110782

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Kathryn Loverance | Chair | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Mark Bradbury | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
The Very Reverend Alexander Fostiropoulos | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Madeline Thomson | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Victoria Anne Turner | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Moses Gyimah Owusu-Sekyere | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Lurliene Miller | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rt Rev Paul Joseph Hendricks | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
James Maurice Laing | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Charles Callan Slipper | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Thavamani Joy | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Christine Allchorn | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen John Fowler | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev DAVID FRANK LAVENDER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.