THE JUDD SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110321
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 18 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required