THE JUDD SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £60.39k £29.54k £32.35k £21.01k £15.28k
Total expenditure £32.96k £45.43k £37.43k £4.22k £13.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A