Financial history AUTISM ALLIANCE UK

Charity number: 1112897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £245.00k £139.26k £65.75k £92.51k £58.50k
Total expenditure £232.28k £98.66k £59.65k £84.29k £2.59k
Income from government contracts £168.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £62.76k £4.00k N/A N/A