YALA HEALTH AND EDUCATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yala Health and Education Fund was created to adminster a --ú70,000 bequest from De Beers towards helping tsunami-affected communities in Sri Lanka. The programme includes sponsoring 50 tsunami children over three years as well as supporting schools, orphanages and a maternity clinic in Hambantota. YHEF is closed to new donations. It is a sister charity to Yala Fund reg. charity no. 1111692.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 29 June 2005: Standard registration
- 24 October 2008: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.68k | £890 | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.36k | £16.32k | £9.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 01 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 28 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 31 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 26 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 26 May 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES IN SRI LANKA (IN PARTICULAR THE COASTAL COMMUNITIES NEAR YALA NATIONAL PARK) WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF THE EARTHQUAKE AND TSUNAMI DISASTER THAT OCCURRED ON 26TH DECEMBER 2004 MAINLY BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE FOLLOWING BY: (A) RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND/OR MAINTAINING SCHOOLS; AND (C) PROTECTING AND PRESERVING HEALTH AND RELIEVING THE SICK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND/OR MAINTAINING MEDICAL CLINICS AND/OR PROVIDING MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window