Trustees THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF PLAY THERAPISTS LIMITED
Charity number: 1115673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Benson | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne McLaughlin | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Kilgallon | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Olaxi Murray | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Boyle | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lanigan | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Lee | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Esther Schencks | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Kelly | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Greenwood | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Faa-Thomson | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Hill | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew O'Mahony | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.